Paul Ellering is an American professional wrestling manager, professional wrestler and dog musher. He is currently signed with WWE to a legends contract. Ellering spent most of his wrestling career managing the Road Warriors (Animal and Hawk), working with them from 1983 to 1990 and again on occasion between 1992 and 1997. In addition to being their on screen manager he actually handled the team's affairs outside the ring as well, including contract negotiations and travel arrangements. Ellering and the Road Warriors were inducted into both the Professional Wrestling Hall of Fame and the WWE Hall of Fame in 2011. Five years later, in June 2016, he returned to the ring at NXT TakeOver: The End as the manager of The Authors of Pain, a heel tag team making their debut. Ellering has been labeled as one of the greatest wrestling managers of all time. Prior to becoming a manager he was a professional wrestler, but due to injuries retired in 1983 to become a full-time manager, only wrestling on special occasions. In the late 1990s he was involved in a storyline where he actually turned on the Road Warriors and managed Disciples of Apocalypse as they fought the Road Warriors. After retiring from full-time activity in wrestling, he raced in the Iditarod and John Beargrease Dog Sled Race.
Birthday: August 22, 1953
December 29, 1985
October 22, 1992
February 24, 1985
December 25, 1985
December 04, 1983
March 18, 1989
September 25, 1985
September 10, 2013
April 07, 2024
September 27, 1998
June 08, 2016
June 14, 2005
November 19, 2016
April 02, 2011
June 14, 2005
April 10, 2007
July 15, 2014
February 07, 1986
February 07, 1987
February 03, 2004
July 26, 1986
April 20, 1986
July 16, 1985
January 24, 1988
October 23, 1983
April 21, 1985
April 23, 1988
March 27, 1988
December 07, 1988
February 15, 1989
April 02, 1989
July 23, 1989
September 12, 1989
October 28, 1989
November 15, 1989
December 13, 1989
February 06, 1990
August 16, 1985
February 25, 1990
May 19, 1990
May 07, 1989
April 19, 1986
December 26, 1988
June 30, 1984
July 05, 1986
July 26, 1986
November 27, 1986
April 11, 1987
November 26, 1987
September 01, 1986
February 14, 1986
May 30, 1984
August 29, 1992
April 05, 1992
July 26, 1998
October 18, 1998
January 28, 2017