Harley Leland Race is a retired American professional wrestler and is a current promoter and trainer. During his career as a wrestler, he held the NWA World Heavyweight Championship 8 times, and is considered by many to be the greatest wrestler of all time. He worked for all of the major wrestling promotions, including the National Wrestling Alliance (NWA), the American Wrestling Association (AWA), WWE, and World Championship Wrestling (WCW). He was the first NWA United States Heavyweight Champion, which is now known as the WWE United States Championship. Race is one of six men inducted into each of the WWE Hall of Fame, the WCW Hall of Fame, the Professional Wrestling Hall of Fame and the Wrestling Observer Newsletter Hall of Fame.
Birthday: April 11, 1943
Death: August 01, 2019
December 26, 2006
March 29, 1987
November 24, 1988
November 24, 1983
July 07, 1990
October 27, 1991
October 17, 2006
February 24, 1985
April 09, 2023
August 15, 2012
November 01, 1998
September 25, 1985
July 01, 2014
November 03, 1999
August 13, 2013
December 07, 2010
August 20, 1986
October 15, 1986
June 24, 1987
July 27, 1988
April 22, 2009
October 05, 1997
January 01, 2007
November 06, 1987
May 04, 1986
November 01, 1987
January 05, 1987
Invalid Date
April 14, 2009
March 12, 2004
September 05, 2017
January 01, 2012
February 09, 1985
April 15, 2007
February 10, 2009
January 03, 2012
March 09, 2004
July 08, 2008
November 18, 2014
January 13, 1993
April 20, 1986
February 01, 1987
January 25, 1978
August 15, 1982
January 24, 1988
March 27, 1988
September 02, 1992
January 15, 1989
January 01, 1982
June 04, 1982
September 07, 1983
June 17, 1983
January 21, 1992
August 03, 1980
February 22, 1981
August 27, 1986
November 26, 1987
July 14, 1991
December 28, 1992
October 25, 1992
November 19, 1991
December 29, 1991
February 21, 1993
February 29, 1992
May 23, 1993
August 18, 1993
June 16, 1993
July 18, 1993
September 19, 1993
October 24, 1993
December 27, 1993
November 10, 1993
November 20, 1993
April 17, 1994
May 22, 1994
February 20, 1994
January 27, 1994
May 17, 1992
July 17, 1994
October 23, 1994
November 16, 1994
July 12, 1992
December 27, 1994