Tang Ching or Tang Jing (Chinese: 唐菁; born 1 January 1924) is a retired Chinese film actor and businessman from Zhengzhou, Henan, working in the Cinema of Taiwan and the Cinema of Hong Kong. He starred in at least 70 films between 1956 and 1984, most of them kung-fu pictures of the 1970s. He initially moved to Taiwan in 1949, where he joined the army troupe in 1949. He began his acting career there at the Agricultural Education Films Company and was then contracted by the Motion Picture & General Investment Co. Ltd by Yuen Chau Fung in 1963. He joined the Shaw Brothers studio in Hong Kong in 1967.
Birthday: January 01, 1924
Death: July 17, 2019
May 24, 1984
April 07, 1966
January 01, 1977
September 18, 1962
July 19, 1969
February 26, 1959
February 14, 1969
October 30, 1956
September 17, 1959
November 14, 1968
July 19, 1963
January 11, 1967
February 17, 1971
March 25, 1982
May 28, 1970
January 09, 1965
May 26, 1977
January 01, 1980
March 25, 1977
August 07, 1980
January 22, 1971
December 11, 1980
February 19, 1982
January 01, 1979
August 26, 1967
May 19, 1977
May 29, 1968
February 05, 1981
September 26, 1981
April 04, 1980
January 28, 1972
February 08, 1975
November 23, 1967
April 13, 1972
January 01, 1959
April 11, 1974
April 19, 1973
October 22, 1981
November 26, 1982
October 03, 1979
January 22, 1979
August 17, 1967
November 23, 1977
May 27, 1965
September 05, 1979
July 18, 1979
July 10, 1976
November 08, 1978
December 16, 1982
January 01, 1978
May 11, 1978
December 29, 1977
July 20, 1978
July 01, 1976
January 29, 1976
October 17, 1980
September 01, 1962
January 23, 1964
September 19, 1964
January 01, 1973
August 26, 1981
July 19, 1974
April 05, 1979
June 11, 1982
July 12, 1972
June 09, 1978